TX SB768 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to increasing the criminal penalties for manufacture or delivery of fentanyl and related substances; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to increasing the criminal penalties for manufacture or delivery of fentanyl and related substances; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1534 (Y: 130 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1534
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-25HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-25HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-17HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2021-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-07HouseFailed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-07HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-04-07HouseRead first time
2021-03-30HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-03-29SenateReported engrossed
2021-03-29SenateRecord vote
2021-03-29SenatePassed
2021-03-29SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-29SenateRecord vote
2021-03-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-03-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-03-29SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-03-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-03-29SenateAmended
2021-03-29SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman
2021-03-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-03-29SenateAmended
2021-03-29SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman
2021-03-29SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-29SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-29SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-23SenateFiled
2021-02-23SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB768
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00768I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00768S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00768E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00768H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00768F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00768S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00768S2F2.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00768I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00768I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00768E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00768H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00768F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-29-F.PDF#page=36
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB768&RcdVtNo=1534&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback