TX SB763 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the urban air mobility advisory committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the urban air mobility advisory committee.

Sponsors

Sen. Beverly Powell [D]Sen. Kelly Hancock [R]Sen. Royce West [D]Rep. David Cook [R]
Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]
Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Michelle Beckley [D]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]
Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]
Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]
Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Elizabeth Campos [D]Rep. Terry Canales [D]
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Jeff Cason [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]
Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. Tom Craddick [R]
Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D]Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]
Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Harold Dutton [D]
Rep. Jake Ellzey [R]Rep. Art Fierro [D]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]
Rep. Gary Gates [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]
Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]
Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Donna Howard [D]
Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Lacey Hull [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]
Rep. Jacey Jetton [R]Rep. Ann Johnson [D]Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]Rep. Julie Johnson [D]
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Tracy King [D]
Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]
Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]
Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]
Rep. Terry Meza [D]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]
Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D]Rep. Christina Morales [D]Rep. Eddie Morales [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]
Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]
Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Claudia Ordaz Perez [D]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]
Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]
Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Four Price [R]
Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]
Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]Rep. Glenn Rogers [R]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]
Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Mike Schofield [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. Carl Sherman [D]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Bryan Slaton [R]Rep. Shelby Slawson [R]
Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. David Spiller [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]
Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Chris Turner [D]
Rep. John Turner [D]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Cody Vasut [R]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]
Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]
Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]

Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective immediately
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-27SenateRead
2021-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-18SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseRecord vote RV#951
2021-05-11HousePassed
2021-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-11HouseAmended 1-Cook
2021-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 2637
2021-05-11HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-04HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-26HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-04-26HouseRead first time
2021-04-21HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-20SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-20SenateRecord vote
2021-04-20SenatePassed
2021-04-20SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-20SenateRecord vote
2021-04-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-20SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-15SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Transportation
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-23SenateFiled
2021-02-23SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2637 (Same As) 2021-05-11 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB763
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00763I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00763S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00763E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00763H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00763F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00763H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00763I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00763I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00763E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00763H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00763F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00763F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-20-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB763&RcdVtNo=951&Ch=H&Dt=05/11/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=59

Bill Comments 750

feedback