TX SB759 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of the office of food system security and resiliency in the Department of Agriculture.
Title
Relating to the establishment of the office of food system security and resiliency in the Department of Agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3322 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB3322 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2886 (Similar To) 2023-05-11 - Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
HB2886 (Similar To) 2023-05-11 - Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
HB3322 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2886 (Similar To) 2023-05-11 - Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
HB2886 (Similar To) 2023-05-11 - Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB759 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB00759I.htm |