TX SB749 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to level of care designations for hospitals that provide neonatal and maternal care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to level of care designations for hospitals that provide neonatal and maternal care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-04-03HouseRead first time
2019-04-02HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-01SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-01SenateRemarks ordered printed
2019-04-01SenateRecord vote
2019-04-01SenatePassed
2019-04-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-01SenateRecord vote
2019-04-01SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-01SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-01SenateAmended
2019-04-01SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst
2019-04-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-01SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-05SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-05SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-11SenateFiled
2019-02-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3269 (Same As) 2019-03-13 - Referred to Public Health

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback