TX SB747 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to required notice of the cost and health benefit plan coverage of newborn screening tests.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to required notice of the cost and health benefit plan coverage of newborn screening tests.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1370 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1370
2019-05-14HousePassed
2019-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-13HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-13HouseAmended 1-Lucio
2019-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-13HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-04-12HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-01SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-27SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-27SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-21SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-11SenateFiled
2019-02-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2582 (Same As) 2019-04-16 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback