TX SB743 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the governing body of the independent organization to ensure access, reliability, adequacy, production, and market information of the ERCOT power region.
Title
Relating to the governing body of the independent organization to ensure access, reliability, adequacy, production, and market information of the ERCOT power region.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2354 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB743 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00743I.htm |