TX SB743 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-18 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-18 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the penalties prescribed for repeated violations of certain court orders or conditions of bond in a family violence case.
Title
Relating to the penalties prescribed for repeated violations of certain court orders or conditions of bond in a family violence case.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - House - SB 743Third Reading House (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-18 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-05-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-09 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-08 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-07 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-07 | House | Passed |
2013-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-06 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-06 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2013-04-22 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Family
Family--Family Violence
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Family
Family--Family Violence
PROTECTIVE ORDERS