TX SB743 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the time allowed for execution of a search warrant issued to obtain a specimen for DNA analysis.
Title
Relating to the time allowed for execution of a search warrant issued to obtain a specimen for DNA analysis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-28 | Record vote | |
2009-05-28 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2009-05-28 | Read | |
2009-05-28 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-21 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-20 | Record vote | |
2009-05-20 | Passed | |
2009-05-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-19 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-19 | Amended | |
2009-05-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-12 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-07 | Reported favorably as amended | |
2009-05-07 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2009-05-07 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-29 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-04-29 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Passed | |
2009-04-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-23 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-23 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-02-25 | Read first time | |
2009-02-10 | Filed | |
2009-02-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2133 (Similar To) 2009-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
DNA
MAGISTRATES
SEARCH WARRANTS
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
DNA
MAGISTRATES
SEARCH WARRANTS