TX SB741 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the carrying or storage of a handgun by a school marshal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the carrying or storage of a handgun by a school marshal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - House - Record vote RV#1471 (Y: 91 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1470 (Y: 66 N: 82 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1469 (Y: 62 N: 82 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1471
2021-05-25HousePassed
2021-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1470
2021-05-25HouseAmendment fails of adoption 2-Goodwin
2021-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1469
2021-05-25HouseAmendment fails of adoption 1-Ortega
2021-05-25HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-12HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-05HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2021-05-05HouseRead first time
2021-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-05-03SenateReported engrossed
2021-05-03SenateRecord vote
2021-05-03SenatePassed
2021-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-03SenateRecord vote
2021-05-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Education
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-23SenateFiled
2021-02-23SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB741
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00741I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00741S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00741E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00741H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00741F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00741H31.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00741H32.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00741I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00741I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00741E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00741H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00741F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-28-F.PDF#page=20
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-03-F.PDF#page=24
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-03-F.PDF#page=25
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB741&RcdVtNo=1469&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB741&RcdVtNo=1470&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB741&RcdVtNo=1471&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback