TX SB741 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to restrictive covenants regarding firearms or firearm ammunition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to restrictive covenants regarding firearms or firearm ammunition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1646 (Y: 106 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1646
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-24HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-04-24HouseRead first time
2019-04-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenatePassed
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-17SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-11SenateFiled
2019-02-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback