TX SB738 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the transfer of certain suits affecting the parent-child relationship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the transfer of certain suits affecting the parent-child relationship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 See remarks for effective date
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-19HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-17HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-15HouseReferred to Human Services
2017-05-15HouseRead first time
2017-04-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-27SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-27SenateRecord vote
2017-04-27SenatePassed
2017-04-27SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-27SenateRecord vote
2017-04-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27SenateAmended
2017-04-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-02-21SenateRead first time
2017-02-03SenateFiled
2017-02-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback