TX SB725 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-20)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the donation and distribution of food at public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the donation and distribution of food at public schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-20 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1435 (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - RV#1434 (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective immediately
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-25HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-25SenateRecord vote
2017-05-25SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-25SenateRead
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-20HouseRecord vote
2017-05-20HousePassed as amended
2017-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-20HouseRecord vote
2017-05-20HouseAmended
2017-05-20HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-20HousePostponed
2017-05-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-19HouseAmended
2017-05-19HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-19HousePostponed
2017-05-19HousePoint of order withdrawn
2017-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-19HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-05-03HouseRead first time
2017-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenatePassed
2017-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-19SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-12SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-11SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-11SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21SenateReferred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
2017-02-21SenateRead first time
2017-02-03SenateFiled
2017-02-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB725
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00725I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00725S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00725E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00725H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00725F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-19-F1.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB725&RcdVtNo=1434&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB725&RcdVtNo=1435&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=153

Bill Comments

feedback