TX SB722 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibiting a severance payment to a superintendent of a school district in certain circumstances.
Title
Relating to prohibiting a severance payment to a superintendent of a school district in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] | Rep. Dan Huberty [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB880 (Same As) 2019-03-13 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
Salaries & Expenses
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
Salaries & Expenses