TX SB721 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to treatment and care provided by licensed medical professionals to animals in certain facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to treatment and care provided by licensed medical professionals to animals in certain facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1358 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective immediately
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-25HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-25SenateRecord vote
2017-05-25SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-25SenateRead
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HousePassed
2017-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-19HouseAmended
2017-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-08HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-06HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-06HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-02HouseReferred to Agriculture & Livestock
2017-05-02HouseRead first time
2017-03-21HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-20SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-20SenateRecord vote
2017-03-20SenatePassed
2017-03-20SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-20SenateRecord vote
2017-03-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-03-20SenateRecord vote
2017-03-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21SenateReferred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
2017-02-21SenateRead first time
2017-02-14SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-13SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-02SenateFiled
2017-02-02SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB721
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00721I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00721S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00721E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00721H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00721F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-20-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-20-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB721&RcdVtNo=1358&Ch=H&Dt=05/19/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=151

Bill Comments

feedback