TX SB717 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reappraisal for ad valorem tax purposes of property damaged in a disaster.
Title
Relating to the reappraisal for ad valorem tax purposes of property damaged in a disaster.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Taylor [R] | Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] | Rep. Sarah Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-04-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-28 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts