TX SB715 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of sports wagering; requiring occupational permits; authorizing fees; imposing a tax; decriminalizing wagering on certain sports events; creating criminal offenses; providing administrative penalties.
Title
Relating to the regulation of sports wagering; requiring occupational permits; authorizing fees; imposing a tax; decriminalizing wagering on certain sports events; creating criminal offenses; providing administrative penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1942 (Same As) 2023-05-12 - Received from the House
SJR39 (Enabling for) 2023-03-16 - Co-author authorized
SJR39 (Enabling for) 2023-03-16 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
GAMBLING
LOTTERY COMMISSION, TEXAS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PERMITS
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--General
TEXAS SPORTS & ENTERTAINMENT RECOVERY ACT
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
GAMBLING
LOTTERY COMMISSION, TEXAS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PERMITS
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--General
TEXAS SPORTS & ENTERTAINMENT RECOVERY ACT
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB715 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB00715I.htm |