TX SB711 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to allowing safety recall information to be included in a vehicle inspection report.
Title
Relating to allowing safety recall information to be included in a vehicle inspection report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1552 (Y: 135 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1523 (Y: 78 N: 60 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1523 (Y: 78 N: 60 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | House | Record vote RV#1552 |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | House | Record vote RV#1523 |
2019-05-20 | House | Amendment tabled 1-Schaefer |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hinojosa |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1692 (Same As) 2019-04-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Safety
VEHICLE INSPECTIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Safety
VEHICLE INSPECTIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration