TX SB707 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the admissibility of certain recorded statements made by child abuse victims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the admissibility of certain recorded statements made by child abuse victims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-05-09HouseRead first time
2017-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenatePassed
2017-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-02-21SenateRead first time
2017-02-01SenateFiled
2017-02-01SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback