TX SB704 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the transfer of the regulation of racing to the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation, the abolishment of the Texas Racing Commission, and the creation of the Texas Racing Advisory Board, following recommendations of the Sunset Advisory Commission.
Title
Relating to the transfer of the regulation of racing to the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation, the abolishment of the Texas Racing Commission, and the creation of the Texas Racing Advisory Board, following recommendations of the Sunset Advisory Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2021-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-05 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1855 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
GREYHOUND RACING
HORSE RACING
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
RACING ADVISORY BOARD, TEXAS
RACING COMMISSION, TEXAS
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Sunset—Required Reviews
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
GREYHOUND RACING
HORSE RACING
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
RACING ADVISORY BOARD, TEXAS
RACING COMMISSION, TEXAS
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Sunset—Required Reviews