TX SB703 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the continuation and functions of the Department of Agriculture, the Prescribed Burning Board, and the Texas Boll Weevil Eradication Foundation and the abolishment of the Early Childhood Health and Nutrition Interagency Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the continuation and functions of the Department of Agriculture, the Prescribed Burning Board, and the Texas Boll Weevil Eradication Foundation and the abolishment of the Early Childhood Health and Nutrition Interagency Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1300 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-30HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-30HouseSenate discharges conferees-reported
2021-05-29SenateRecord vote
2021-05-29SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-29SenateSenate discharges conferees
2021-05-25HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-25HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-25HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2021-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2021-05-25SenateRead
2021-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1300
2021-05-23HousePassed
2021-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-20HouseAmendment adopted as amended 4-Goldman
2021-05-20HouseAmendment amended 5-Goldman
2021-05-20HouseAmendment(s) offered 4-Goldman
2021-05-20HouseAmendment fails of adoption 3-K. King
2021-05-20HouseAmendment withdrawn 2-K. King
2021-05-20HouseAmended 1-T. King
2021-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-20HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-21HouseReferred to Agriculture & Livestock
2021-04-21HouseRead first time
2021-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateAmended
2021-04-19SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Gutierrez
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-13SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-25SenateFiled
2021-02-25SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1835 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Agriculture & Livestock

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB703
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00703I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00703S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00703E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00703H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00703F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00703S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00703H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00703H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00703H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00703H24.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00703H25.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00703I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00703I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00703S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00703S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00703E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00703H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00703F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00703F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-19-F.PDF#page=23
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB703&RcdVtNo=1300&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-29-F.PDF#page=99
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-19-F.PDF#page=23

Bill Comments

feedback