TX SB701 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-12 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a highway toll exemption for public school buses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a highway toll exemption for public school buses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-12SenateCo-author authorized
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Transportation
2023-03-01SenateRead first time
2023-02-03SenateFiled
2023-02-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB677 (Same As) 2023-05-08 - Referred to Transportation
HB686 (Same As) 2023-02-23 - Referred to Transportation
HB1081 (Same As) 2023-03-02 - Referred to Transportation
HB677 (Same As) 2023-05-08 - Referred to Transportation
HB4679 (Same As) 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback