TX SB698 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of a court to grant a motion for a new trial in certain criminal cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of a court to grant a motion for a new trial in certain criminal cases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-22SenateFiled
2021-02-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1293 (Same As) 2021-04-23 - Received from the House

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback