TX SB698 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the expedited processing of certain applications for permits under the Texas Clean Air Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the expedited processing of certain applications for permits under the Texas Clean Air Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1415 (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-02 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-02 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-17SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-16SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-16SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-16HouseRecord vote RV#1415
2019-05-16HousePassed
2019-05-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-15HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-15HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-09HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2019-04-01HouseRead first time
2019-03-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-03-26SenateReported engrossed
2019-03-26SenateRecord vote
2019-03-26SenatePassed
2019-03-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-26SenateRecord vote
2019-03-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-03-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-03-26SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-03-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-07SenateFiled
2019-02-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1688 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Environmental Regulation

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback