TX SB689 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to restrictions on the use of the Internet by sex offenders and to the reporting, collection, and exchange of information regarding those offenders; providing a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to restrictions on the use of the Internet by sex offenders and to the reporting, collection, and exchange of information regarding those offenders; providing a civil penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-28 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-21 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-20 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-13 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-13 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-11 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-05-11 | Read first time | |
2009-05-04 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-04 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-04 | Record vote | |
2009-05-04 | Passed | |
2009-05-04 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-04 | Record vote | |
2009-05-04 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-04 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-04 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-04 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-04 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-29 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-27 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-23 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-02-23 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-02-05 | Filed | |
2009-02-05 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1239 (Similar To) 2009-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
INTERNET
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SEXUAL OFFENDERS
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
INTERNET
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SEXUAL OFFENDERS