TX SB687 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exclusion from total revenue of certain payments received by health care providers for purposes of computing the franchise tax.
Title
Relating to the exclusion from total revenue of certain payments received by health care providers for purposes of computing the franchise tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SB687 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SB00687I.htm |