TX SB678 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the small-sized district adjustment under the Foundation School Program.
Title
Relating to the small-sized district adjustment under the Foundation School Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Nichols [R] | Sen. Charles Perry [R] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] |
Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB678 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00678I.htm |