TX SB678 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to coordinated county transportation authorities.
Title
Relating to coordinated county transportation authorities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Rep. Ron Simmons [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - SB 678Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-23 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-14 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-13 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-13 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-13 | House | Passed |
2015-05-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-12 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-12 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-04 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
CONDEMNATION
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Transportation
Transportation--Railroads
CONDEMNATION
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Transportation
Transportation--Railroads