TX SB670 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to telemedicine and telehealth services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to telemedicine and telehealth services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1374 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-21HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-21SenateRead
2019-05-21SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-14SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1374
2019-05-14HousePassed
2019-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-13HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-13HouseAmended 2-Oliverson
2019-05-13HouseAmended 1-Schaefer
2019-05-13HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-05-13HousePostponed 5/13/19 2:50 PM
2019-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-13HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-29HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-04-01HouseRead first time
2019-03-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-03-27SenateReported engrossed
2019-03-27SenateRecord vote
2019-03-27SenatePassed
2019-03-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-27SenateRecord vote
2019-03-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-03-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-03-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-03-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-12SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-06SenateFiled
2019-02-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB870 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback