TX SB669 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 64-13)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-26 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the system for protesting or appealing certain ad valorem tax determinations; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the system for protesting or appealing certain ad valorem tax determinations; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors

Sen. Jane Nelson [R]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R]Sen. Charles Creighton [R]
Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D]Sen. Joan Huffman [R]Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R]Sen. Carlos Uresti [D]
Rep. John Zerwas [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]
Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R]
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]
Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Byron Cook [R]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]
Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]
Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Lance Gooden [R]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]
Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]
Rep. Mark Keough [R]Rep. Linda Koop [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]
Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]
Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]
Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]
Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Larry Phillips [R]
Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R]
Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Leighton Schubert [R]
Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]
Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Jason Villalba [R]Rep. Paul Workman [R]
Rep. William Zedler [R]

Roll Calls

2017-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1486 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1445 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - 3-Sanford RV#1444 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-25SenateRead
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-21HouseRecord vote
2017-05-21HousePassed
2017-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-20HouseRecord vote
2017-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-20HouseRecord vote
2017-05-20HouseAmended
2017-05-20HouseAmended
2017-05-20HouseAmended
2017-05-20HouseAmended
2017-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-18HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-18HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2017-04-18HouseRead first time
2017-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-10SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-10SenateRecord vote
2017-04-10SenatePassed
2017-04-10SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-10SenateRecord vote
2017-04-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-10SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-06SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-21SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-15SenateReferred to Finance
2017-02-15SenateRead first time
2017-01-30SenateFiled
2017-01-30SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB669
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00669I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00669S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00669E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00669H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-10-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB669&RcdVtNo=1444&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB669&RcdVtNo=1445&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB669&RcdVtNo=1486&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2017

Bill Comments

feedback