TX SB667 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to probate and guardianship matters and certain procedures for persons who are incapacitated or have a mental illness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to probate and guardianship matters and certain procedures for persons who are incapacitated or have a mental illness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1573 (Y: 115 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - 1-S. Thompson RV#1528 (Y: 76 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23SenateRecord vote
2019-05-23SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-23SenateRead
2019-05-23SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-21SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1573
2019-05-21HousePassed
2019-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-20HouseAmended 3-Hinojosa
2019-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1528
2019-05-20HouseAmended 2-S. Thompson
2019-05-20HouseAmended 1-S. Thompson
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-04-01HouseRead first time
2019-03-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-03-26SenateReported engrossed
2019-03-26SenateRecord vote
2019-03-26SenatePassed
2019-03-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-26SenateRecord vote
2019-03-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-03-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-03-26SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-18SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-18SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-06SenateFiled
2019-02-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3543 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB667
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00667I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00667S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00667E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00667H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00667F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ03-26-F.PDF#page=9
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB667&RcdVtNo=1528&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB667&RcdVtNo=1573&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-23-F.PDF#page=400

Bill Comments

feedback