TX SB666 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the reporting, maintenance, and use of certain misdemeanor conviction information for purposes of the databases used in a federal firearm background check.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the reporting, maintenance, and use of certain misdemeanor conviction information for purposes of the databases used in a federal firearm background check.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-04-26HouseRead first time
2019-04-23HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-23SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-23SenateRecord vote
2019-04-23SenatePassed
2019-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-23SenateRecord vote
2019-04-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-23SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-23SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-23SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-13SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-03-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-06SenateFiled
2019-02-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3812 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback