TX SB666 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the reporting, maintenance, and use of certain misdemeanor conviction information for purposes of the databases used in a federal firearm background check.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the reporting, maintenance, and use of certain misdemeanor conviction information for purposes of the databases used in a federal firearm background check.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-13SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-03-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-06SenateFiled
2019-02-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3812 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback