TX SB660 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to regional coordinators within the veteran entrepreneur program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to regional coordinators within the veteran entrepreneur program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Effective immediately
2015-05-22 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-12 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-12HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-12SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-11SenateReported enrolled
2015-05-11SenateHouse passage reported
2015-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-08HouseRecord vote
2015-05-08HousePassed
2015-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-07HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-07HousePassed to 3rd reading
2015-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-07HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2015-05-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-05-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-29HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2015-04-29HouseRead first time
2015-04-10HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-04-09SenateReported engrossed
2015-04-09SenateRecord vote
2015-04-09SenatePassed
2015-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-09SenateRecord vote
2015-04-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-04-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2015-04-09SenateLaid before the Senate
2015-04-09SenateCo-author authorized
2015-04-09SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2015-04-08SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2015-04-01SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-03-17SenateCo-author authorized
2015-03-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-03-16SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-03-16SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-03-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-02-24SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
2015-02-24SenateRead first time
2015-02-19SenateFiled
2015-02-19SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback