TX SB655 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sale of distilled spirits to ultimate consumers by the holder of a distiller's and rectifier's permit.
Title
Relating to the sale of distilled spirits to ultimate consumers by the holder of a distiller's and rectifier's permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2021-05-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-05 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2021-05-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2021-04-26 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Rereferred to committee |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2890 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Referred directly to subcommittee by chair