TX SB650 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibited logistical support by a governmental entity for procurement of an abortion or the services of an abortion provider.
Title
Relating to prohibited logistical support by a governmental entity for procurement of an abortion or the services of an abortion provider.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-22 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-04-06 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed to engrossment |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA3 Eckhardt |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Eckhardt |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Eckhardt |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1173 (Same As) 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar