TX SB650 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prohibited logistical support by a governmental entity for procurement of an abortion or the services of an abortion provider.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibited logistical support by a governmental entity for procurement of an abortion or the services of an abortion provider.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-22HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-22HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-06HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-06HouseRead first time
2021-04-01HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-03-31SenateReported engrossed
2021-03-31SenateRecord vote
2021-03-31SenatePassed
2021-03-31SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-31SenateRecord vote
2021-03-31SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-31SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-29SenateRecord vote
2021-03-29SenatePassed to engrossment
2021-03-29SenateRecord vote
2021-03-29SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-03-29SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 Eckhardt
2021-03-29SenateRecord vote
2021-03-29SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-03-29SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Eckhardt
2021-03-29SenateRecord vote
2021-03-29SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-03-29SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Eckhardt
2021-03-29SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-29SenateRecord vote
2021-03-29SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-29SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-24SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-03-09SenateCo-author authorized
2021-02-10SenateFiled
2021-02-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1173 (Same As) 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB650
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00650I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00650S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00650E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00650H.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00650S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00650S2F2.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00650S2F3.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00650I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00650I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00650H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-29-F.PDF#page=33
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-29-F.PDF#page=34
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-31-F.PDF#page=10

Bill Comments 750

feedback