TX SB650 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the University of Houston College of Medicine at the University of Houston.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the University of Houston College of Medicine at the University of Houston.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-10SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Higher Education
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-05SenateFiled
2019-02-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB826 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback