TX SB650 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the University of Houston College of Medicine at the University of Houston.
Title
Relating to the creation of the University of Houston College of Medicine at the University of Houston.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Huffman [R] | Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] |
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Sen. Larry Taylor [R] | Sen. John Whitmire [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB826 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON COLLEGE OF MEDICINE
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON COLLEGE OF MEDICINE
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB650 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00650I.htm |