TX SB65 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to oversight of and requirements applicable to state agency contracting and procurement.
Title
Relating to oversight of and requirements applicable to state agency contracting and procurement.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
Rep. Charlie Geren [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Amended RV#1650 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Amended RV#1650 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1650 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-22 | House | Amended 1-Capriglione, Patterson, Noble, Morrison, Hefner, Middleton, Frullo, G. Bonnen, Shaheen, More |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 1-Geren |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-28 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AUDITOR, STATE
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Electronic Information Systems
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
LOBBYISTS & LOBBYING
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE LIBRARY & ARCHIVES COMMISSION, TEXAS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Electronic Information Systems
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
LOBBYISTS & LOBBYING
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE LIBRARY & ARCHIVES COMMISSION, TEXAS