TX SB644 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Summary

Relating to modifications, adjustments, and reimbursements under the public school finance system and contract delegation authority for a school district located in a disaster area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to modifications, adjustments, and reimbursements under the public school finance system and contract delegation authority for a school district located in a disaster area.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-19 Committee report sent to Calendars
2009-05-18 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-05-18 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2009-05-15 Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2009-05-15 Considered in public hearing
2009-05-12 Left pending in committee
2009-05-12 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2009-05-12 Considered in public hearing
2009-05-12 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-05-04 Referred to Public Education
2009-05-04 Read first time
2009-04-29 Received from the Senate
2009-04-28 Reported engrossed
2009-04-28 Record vote
2009-04-28 Passed
2009-04-28 Read 3rd time
2009-04-28 Record vote
2009-04-28 Three day rule suspended
2009-04-28 Vote recorded in Journal
2009-04-28 Passed to engrossment as amended
2009-04-28 Vote recorded in Journal
2009-04-28 Amended
2009-04-28 Amendment(s) offered
2009-04-28 Vote recorded in Journal
2009-04-28 Amended
2009-04-28 Amendment(s) offered
2009-04-28 Read 2nd time
2009-04-28 Rules suspended-Regular order of business
2009-04-27 Placed on intent calendar
2009-04-14 Not again placed on intent calendar
2009-04-08 Placed on intent calendar
2009-04-07 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-04-07 Reported favorably as substituted
2009-04-02 Considered in public hearing
2009-04-02 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-04-02 Posting rule suspended
2009-03-09 Co-author authorized
2009-03-03 Left pending in committee
2009-03-03 Testimony taken in committee
2009-03-03 Considered in public hearing
2009-03-03 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-02-23 Referred to Education
2009-02-23 Read first time
2009-02-18 Co-author authorized
2009-02-10 Co-author authorized
2009-02-03 Filed
2009-02-03 Received by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback