TX SB642 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a common characteristic or use project in a public improvement district in certain municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a common characteristic or use project in a public improvement district in certain municipalities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-05SenateFiled
2019-02-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1135 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback