TX SB639 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to remote meetings under the open meetings law.
Title
Relating to remote meetings under the open meetings law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2560 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB639 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00639I.htm |