TX SB636 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requirements for and the transparency of epidemiological reports and certain immunization exemption information and reports.
Title
Relating to requirements for and the transparency of epidemiological reports and certain immunization exemption information and reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
IMMUNIZATIONS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
IMMUNIZATIONS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF