TX SB636 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the enforcement of commercial motor vehicle safety standards in certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the enforcement of commercial motor vehicle safety standards in certain municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1172 (Y: 125 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-21 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-09 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1172 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-08 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-08 | House | Postponed 5/8/19 4:00 PM |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 1308 |
2019-04-29 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-24 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-24 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-04-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-27 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1308 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call