TX SB633 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an initiative to increase the capacity of local mental health authorities to provide access to mental health services in certain counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an initiative to increase the capacity of local mental health authorities to provide access to mental health services in certain counties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1551 (Y: 141 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective immediately
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1551
2019-05-21HousePassed
2019-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20HouseAmendment tabled 1-Price
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-13HouseReported favorably as amended
2019-05-13HouseAmendment(s) considered in committee
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-04-12HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-10SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-10SenateRecord vote
2019-04-10SenatePassed
2019-04-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-10SenateRecord vote
2019-04-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-10SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-10SenateAmended
2019-04-10SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst
2019-04-10SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-10SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-04SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-19SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-18SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-05SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-05SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-13SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-04SenateFiled
2019-02-04SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1598 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Public Health

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback