TX SB633 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain event trust funds and the abolishment of the special event trust fund.
Title
Relating to certain event trust funds and the abolishment of the special event trust fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Fraser [R] | Rep. Jason Isaac [R] | Rep. Jason Villalba [R] | Rep. Cecil Bell [R] |
Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Rep. Charles Anderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - House - SB 633Third Reading House (Y: 116 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-25 - House - SB 633Third Reading House (Y: 104 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-25 - House - SB 633Third Reading House (Y: 104 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-29 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | House | Passed |
2015-05-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-25 | House | Amended |
2015-05-25 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2015-05-25 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-25 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-25 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2015-05-25 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2015-05-25 | House | Amendment amended |
2015-05-25 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-25 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-25 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-21 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2015-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
City Government
City Government--Finance
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
County Government
County Government--Finance
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM, OFFICE OF
Governor
PAN AMERICAN GAMES
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
City Government
City Government--Finance
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
County Government
County Government--Finance
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM, OFFICE OF
Governor
PAN AMERICAN GAMES
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control