TX SB633 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to liability of certain electric utilities that allow certain uses of land that the electric utility owns, occupies, or leases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to liability of certain electric utilities that allow certain uses of land that the electric utility owns, occupies, or leases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-03-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-11SenateLeft pending in committee
2013-03-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-03-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-25SenateReferred to State Affairs
2013-02-25SenateRead first time
2013-02-18SenateFiled
2013-02-18SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback