TX SB633 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the educational scope of Texas A&M University--Corpus Christi.
Title
Relating to the educational scope of Texas A&M University--Corpus Christi.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-21 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-21 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-20 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-03 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-02 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-02 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-29 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-29 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-29 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-29 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2011-04-04 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2011-04-04 | Read first time | |
2011-03-24 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-24 | Record vote | |
2011-03-24 | Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-24 | Record vote | |
2011-03-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-24 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-24 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2011-02-23 | Read first time | |
2011-02-14 | Filed | |
2011-02-14 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY--CORPUS CHRISTI
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY--CORPUS CHRISTI