TX SB626 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to guardianships, management trusts, and certain other procedures and proceedings for persons who are incapacitated, probate matters and proceedings, and other matters involving statutory county courts, including statutory probate courts.
Title
Relating to guardianships, management trusts, and certain other procedures and proceedings for persons who are incapacitated, probate matters and proceedings, and other matters involving statutory county courts, including statutory probate courts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1739 (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1274 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1274 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-30 | House | Record vote RV#1739 |
2021-05-30 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-29 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2021-05-27 | House | House appoints conferees |
2021-05-27 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-20 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-20 | House | Record vote RV#1274 |
2021-05-20 | House | Passed |
2021-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-19 | House | Amended 2-Allison |
2021-05-19 | House | Amended 1-Leach and Moody |
2021-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-04-06 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2178 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Subjects
AUCTIONS & AUCTIONEERS
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
GUARDIANS & WARDS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INCAPACITATED PERSONS
JUDICIAL BRANCH CERTIFICATION COMMISSION
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
GUARDIANS & WARDS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INCAPACITATED PERSONS
JUDICIAL BRANCH CERTIFICATION COMMISSION
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts