TX SB622 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to itemizing certain public notice expenditures in certain political subdivision budgets.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to itemizing certain public notice expenditures in certain political subdivision budgets.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - FA1 Perry (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective immediately
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-27SenateRecord vote
2017-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-27SenateRead
2017-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-22HouseReturned from the Governor
2017-05-16SenateSenate adopts resolution recalling from Gov.
2017-05-16HouseHouse adopts resolution recalling from Gov.
2017-05-11 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-11HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-11SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-10SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-10SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-09HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-09HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-05-03HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-27HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-18HouseReferred to Government Transparency & Operation
2017-04-18HouseRead first time
2017-03-30HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-29SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-29SenateRecord vote
2017-03-29SenatePassed
2017-03-29SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-29SenateRecord vote
2017-03-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-29SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-03-29SenateRecord vote
2017-03-29SenateAmended
2017-03-29SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-29SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-29SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-27SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-27SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-22SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-13SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2017-02-13SenateRead first time
2017-02-07SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-26SenateFiled
2017-01-26SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback